USA v. Baehm et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00002 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
131
06/11/2018
Violation Disposition Report
132
06/12/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/13/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
134
07/13/2018
Notice (Other)
135
07/13/2018
Memorandum
136
07/16/2018
Order of Release
07/16/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
138
07/18/2018
Judgment on Revocation
139
07/18/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.