USA v. Bairamis et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cr-00085 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
758
07/23/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
759
07/23/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
07/23/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
761
07/24/2018
Order of Detention
07/24/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
763
07/24/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
764
08/02/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
769
09/11/2018
Notice (Other)
09/19/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
771
09/20/2018
Judgment on Revocation
772
09/20/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
773
09/24/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed
774
09/24/2018
Notice (Other)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.