USA v. Baldwin
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00092-56080 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
123
01/02/2019
Transcript
124
01/29/2019
Vacate (2255)
125
02/14/2019
Order
126
03/28/2019
Memorandum
127
03/28/2019
Hearing
128
04/03/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
129
05/13/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
130
05/13/2019
Declaration
131
05/17/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
132
05/23/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
133
05/24/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
134
05/24/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.