USA v. Ballard
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00053-59860 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
24
06/01/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/04/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
09/11/2018
Unopposed Motion
28
09/14/2018
Notice (Other)
09/14/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
10/04/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
01/03/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
01/04/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
38
01/31/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/05/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address
41
03/26/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
42
04/16/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
43
04/23/2019
Unopposed Motion
04/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.