USA v. Bartlett et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00044 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
494
05/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
495
05/18/2018
Declaration
496
05/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
497
05/18/2018
Declaration
05/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
499
05/31/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
500
06/06/2018
Response in Opposition
501
06/08/2018
Notice (Other)
502
06/08/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
503
06/08/2018
Declaration
504
06/12/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
505
06/22/2018
Appoint Counsel
506
06/22/2018
Declaration
507
06/22/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
508
06/29/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
07/10/2018
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
510
07/10/2018
Dismiss
511
07/10/2018
Declaration
512
07/10/2018
Strike
513
07/10/2018
Declaration
514
07/10/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
515
07/10/2018
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
516
07/11/2018
Order on Motion to Strike
517
07/12/2018
USCA Case Number
518
07/12/2018
USCA Time Schedule Order
519
07/26/2018
USCA Mandate
520
11/15/2018
Order
521
11/29/2018
Vacate (2255)
522
11/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
523
11/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
524
11/29/2018
Declaration
525
11/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
526
11/29/2018
Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
527
11/29/2018
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
528
11/29/2018
Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
529
11/29/2018
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
530
11/30/2018
USCA Case Number
531
11/30/2018
USCA Time Schedule Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.