USA v. Bates
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2010-cr-00120 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
85
05/30/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
06/12/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.