USA v. Baumann et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cr-00052 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
529
05/23/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
530
05/24/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
531
05/25/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
533
05/25/2018
Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)
05/25/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
538
06/26/2018
Notice (Other)
539
07/06/2018
Violation Disposition Report
07/11/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
541
07/13/2018
Judgment on Revocation
542
07/13/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.