USA v. Baumgardner
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00148-58638 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
29
12/13/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
30
12/13/2018
Order of Detention
12/13/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
12/14/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
34
12/14/2018
Order of Release
01/30/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
04/03/2019
Dismiss
04/04/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
04/11/2019
USPO Expiration of Supervision - 34
42
04/12/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.