USA v. Bean
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00034-59519 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
05/31/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
05/31/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
06/07/2018
Response in Opposition
19
06/26/2018
Hearing
06/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/27/2018
Continue
06/27/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
06/28/2018
Third Party Custodian Report
06/28/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
06/28/2018
Unopposed Motion
26
06/28/2018
Bail Review Hearing
27
07/06/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
28
07/06/2018
Notice (Other)
29
07/06/2018
Declaration
07/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
07/06/2018
Evidentiary Hearing
32
07/09/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
07/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
07/09/2018
Transcript
35
07/10/2018
Amended Minute Entry
07/11/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
07/13/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
07/16/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
09/04/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
43
09/21/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
44
10/02/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
45
10/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
46
10/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
47
10/03/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
48
10/03/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
10/09/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
10/26/2018
Notice (Other)
52
10/29/2018
Notice (Other)
10/29/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
11/05/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
58
11/14/2018
Judgment
59
11/14/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.