USA v. Beard
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00029-59267 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
05/21/2018
Hearing
05/22/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
05/23/2018
Third Party Custodian Report
05/25/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
06/20/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
07/24/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
38
07/25/2018
Plea Agreement
39
07/25/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
07/26/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
08/07/2018
Forfeiture of Property
44
08/07/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
45
09/13/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
46
09/14/2018
Unopposed Motion
47
09/14/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
48
09/14/2018
Notice (Other)
49
10/04/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
50
11/14/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
51
11/21/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/28/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
01/17/2019
Unopposed Motion
55
01/18/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion
56
02/27/2019
Unopposed Motion
57
02/28/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion
58
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address
59
03/13/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
60
03/13/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
61
03/19/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
03/19/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
03/19/2019
Unopposed Motion
64
04/10/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
65
04/10/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/17/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
04/25/2019
Judgment
69
04/25/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
70
05/03/2019
Notice (Other)
71
05/07/2019
Forfeiture of Property
72
05/07/2019
Affidavit
73
05/08/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.