USA v. Becker et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00021-53066 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
242
07/30/2018
USCA Order
243
08/21/2018
USCA Mandate
244
10/11/2018
Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Releasee
245
12/11/2018
Forfeiture of Property
246
12/11/2018
Affidavit
247
12/13/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.