USA v. Beebe
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2019-cr-00002-61309 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/21/2019
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
02/21/2019
Indictment - For Public
3
02/21/2019
Order
02/21/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
03/07/2019
Appear
03/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
8
03/07/2019
Pretrial Services Report
03/08/2019
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
03/08/2019
Order
11
03/11/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
12
03/11/2019
Order of Detention
13
03/11/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
14
03/11/2019
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
15
03/19/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
03/19/2019
Amend/Correct
03/20/2019
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
03/20/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
03/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
03/22/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
03/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
04/01/2019
Continue
26
04/01/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
04/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
05/17/2019
Hearing
05/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
05/17/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
32
05/17/2019
Errata
05/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/20/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
05/23/2019
Third Party Custodian Report
05/23/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
05/23/2019
Vacate
36
05/23/2019
Expedite

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.