USA v. Beezley
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00060 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
64
07/03/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - WOA
65
07/03/2018
Order on Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - WOA
07/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
07/05/2018
Order of Detention
07/05/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/07/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/07/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
07/07/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
72
07/07/2018
Order of Release
07/12/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
07/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.