USA v Benjamin Meneses, III et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2006-cr-00089-3046 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
119
04/18/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
120
04/25/2019
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
121
04/25/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
04/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
123
04/26/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
124
04/26/2019
Continue
125
04/26/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
126
04/26/2019
Declaration
04/29/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
128
05/09/2019
Response in Opposition
129
05/14/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
130
05/14/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
131
05/15/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
05/22/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.