USA v. Benton
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00024-55138 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
109
07/30/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
111
11/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
112
11/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
116
01/09/2019
Supplement
117
01/09/2019
Supplement
118
01/24/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
01/25/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
121
01/28/2019
Judgment
122
01/28/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.