USA v. Bermudez
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cr-00055 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
103
05/24/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
104
05/24/2018
Order
05/25/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
116
10/24/2018
Petition for Warrant of Arrest for Offender - 12C
117
10/24/2018
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
10/24/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
119
10/24/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
120
10/25/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
121
10/25/2018
Order of Detention
10/25/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
124
10/29/2018
Notice (Other)
126
11/08/2018
Z-Order Terminating Participant from the Alaska Hope Court Program
127
11/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/26/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
132
11/28/2018
Order of Release
133
11/28/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
135
12/13/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
12/14/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.