USA v. Besetsnzy
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00092 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
42
09/21/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
43
09/21/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
09/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
10/18/2018
Subsequent Petition for Offender - 12C - Sealed pdf
10/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
10/24/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
52
10/24/2018
Notice (Other)
53
10/24/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
54
10/24/2018
Order of Release
55
10/25/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
11/27/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.