USA v. Bey
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2008-cr-00110-9410 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
68
10/15/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
69
10/16/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
10/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
10/24/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
73
10/24/2018
Notice (Other)
74
10/24/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
12/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
12/18/2018
Summons Returned Executed
77
01/16/2019
Subsequent Petition for Offender - 12C - Sealed pdf
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
01/23/2019
Hearing
01/23/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
01/24/2019
Notice (Other)
85
01/24/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
86
01/24/2019
Order of Release
02/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address
03/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
04/12/2019
Unopposed Motion
04/15/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
04/18/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.