USA v. Binion
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00161-61104 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/13/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
12/13/2018
Indictment - For Public
02/22/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
02/22/2019
Pretrial Services Report
02/25/2019
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
02/25/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
7
02/25/2019
Order of Detention
8
02/25/2019
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
10
02/27/2019
Hearing
02/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/28/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
15
03/08/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
03/11/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
18
03/12/2019
Third Party Custodian Report
19
03/13/2019
Bail Review Hearing
20
04/02/2019
Unopposed Motion
21
04/03/2019
Declaration
04/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
04/05/2019
Third Party Custodian Report
04/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
04/05/2019
Unopposed Motion
26
04/12/2019
Continue
27
04/15/2019
Bail Review Hearing
04/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
05/09/2019
Unopposed Motion
31
05/09/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
32
05/09/2019
Declaration
05/10/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/10/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/10/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/10/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/13/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.