USA v. Black
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00125-60910 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/18/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
10/18/2018
Indictment - For Public
10/22/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/01/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
11/01/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
11/01/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/05/2018
Pretrial Services Report
11/07/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
11/07/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
10
11/07/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
11
11/07/2018
Order of Detention
12
12/06/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
12/14/2018
Response in Opposition
12/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
12/19/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
17
12/20/2018
Motion Hearing
01/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
02/08/2019
Notice (Other)
27
02/22/2019
Order
28
03/01/2019
Status Report
03/04/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
03/06/2019
Continue
03/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
33
03/07/2019
Response in Opposition
03/07/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
03/11/2019
Status Report
38
03/19/2019
Order
39
03/25/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
03/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
03/27/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
42
03/28/2019
Plea Agreement
43
03/28/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
03/28/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
04/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
49
04/08/2019
Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.