USA v. Blodgett
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00105 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
84
05/29/2018
Order of Detention
05/29/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
07/27/2018
Violation Disposition Report
08/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
92
08/13/2018
Continue
08/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
08/30/2018
Order of Release
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.