USA v. Blodgett
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00052 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
90
07/16/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/16/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
08/29/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
98
09/05/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
100
09/17/2018
Hearing
09/17/2018
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
103
09/18/2018
Plea Agreement
104
09/18/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
09/18/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
10/26/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
108
11/15/2018
Notice (Other)
109
11/21/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
110
11/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
111
11/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
112
11/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
113
11/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
114
12/03/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
120
12/14/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.