USA v. Blodgett
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00052-57436 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
90
07/16/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/16/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
08/29/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
98
09/05/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
100
09/17/2018
Hearing
09/17/2018
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
103
09/18/2018
Plea Agreement
104
09/18/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
09/18/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
10/26/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
108
11/15/2018
Notice (Other)
109
11/21/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
110
11/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
111
11/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
112
11/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
113
11/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
114
12/03/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
120
12/14/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
121
12/17/2018
Unopposed Motion
122
12/18/2018
Reconsideration
123
12/18/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
124
12/18/2018
Judgment
125
12/18/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
126
12/18/2018
Response in Opposition
127
12/18/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
128
12/19/2018
USCA Case Number
129
12/19/2018
USCA Time Schedule Order
12/19/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
131
12/19/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
132
12/26/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
133
12/26/2018
Transcript
12/27/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
135
12/27/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
136
12/31/2018
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
137
01/04/2019
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
138
01/16/2019
Transcript
139
01/16/2019
Transcript
140
01/16/2019
Transcript

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.