USA v. Boungnavath et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00116-60801 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/21/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
09/21/2018
Indictment - For Public
09/24/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
09/25/2018
Pretrial Services Report
09/25/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/25/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
8
09/25/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
9
09/25/2018
Order of Detention
10
09/25/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
11
09/26/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
12
09/27/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
09/27/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
09/27/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
15
09/28/2018
Pretrial Services Report
09/28/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
09/28/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
18
09/28/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
19
09/28/2018
Order of Detention
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/03/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
10/04/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/04/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
10/04/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
10/04/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10/09/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
10/09/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
30
10/09/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
31
10/09/2018
Order of Detention
32
10/31/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
33
11/05/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11/05/2018
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
11/05/2018
Continue
36
11/06/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
11/07/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
11/19/2018
Hearing
39
11/19/2018
Declaration
11/19/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
11/27/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
46
11/27/2018
Order of Release
49
01/07/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
01/16/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
01/18/2019
Order of Detention
53
02/08/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
02/11/2019
Clerks Notice of Non-Compliance With Order of Progression (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
02/13/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
02/13/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
04/03/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
04/04/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
04/16/2019
Continue
70
04/16/2019
Declaration
04/16/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
05/03/2019
Plea Agreement
78
05/03/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
05/07/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.