USA v. Brandner
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00103-49656 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
377
11/15/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
379
11/27/2018
Vacate (2255)
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
381
02/12/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
382
02/12/2019
Compel
383
02/12/2019
Declaration
384
02/19/2019
Order
02/19/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
386
03/20/2019
Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)
387
03/22/2019
Objection to Report and Recommendations
388
03/29/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
389
04/02/2019
Order on Motion to Compel
390
04/18/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
391
05/08/2019
Reduce Sentence
392
05/08/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.