USA v. Braswell
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:1997-cr-00068-1274 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
502
05/21/2018
USCA Order
503
05/21/2018
Notice (Other)
504
06/11/2018
USCA Mandate
505
01/29/2019
Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment
506
01/29/2019
Notice (Other)
507
02/05/2019
Response in Opposition
02/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
509
02/12/2019
Order
510
02/15/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
511
02/25/2019
Notice (Other)
512
02/26/2019
Response in Opposition
513
03/04/2019
Order
514
03/05/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
515
03/05/2019
Affidavit
516
03/19/2019
Notice (Other)
517
03/20/2019
Order
518
03/28/2019
Notice (Other)
519
03/28/2019
Memorandum
520
03/29/2019
Order
521
04/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
522
04/02/2019
Notice (Other)
523
04/02/2019
Notice (Other)
524
04/04/2019
Order
525
04/16/2019
Notice (Other)
526
04/16/2019
Notice (Other)
527
04/16/2019
Order
528
04/26/2019
Hearing
529
04/26/2019
Notice (Other)
530
04/26/2019
Response in Opposition
531
05/09/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.