USA v. Brawford
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00073-60326 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/26/2018
Information - Felony
06/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/26/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
4
06/27/2018
Plea Agreement
5
06/27/2018
Appear
6
06/27/2018
Unopposed Motion
7
06/29/2018
Pretrial Services Report
07/02/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/29/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
11
07/03/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
12
07/03/2018
Waiver of Indictment
13
07/03/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
07/03/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
07/24/2018
Unopposed Motion
17
07/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
18
07/27/2018
Notice (Other)
07/31/2018
Order of Recusal (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
05/14/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.