USA v. Brink
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00016-61137 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
12/27/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
12/27/2018
Pretrial Services Report
8
12/31/2018
Third Party Custodian Report
9
12/31/2018
Arraignment
10
01/02/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
11
01/02/2019
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
12
01/02/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
13
01/02/2019
Order of Release
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/08/2019
Order
01/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/08/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
18
01/09/2019
Unopposed Motion
19
01/09/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/09/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/09/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
01/10/2019
Third Party Custodian Report
23
01/11/2019
Notice (Other)
01/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
01/15/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
27
01/28/2019
Unopposed Motion
28
01/28/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
01/30/2019
Errata
01/31/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
02/01/2019
Passport Surrendered
02/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
02/20/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/21/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.