USA v. Brown
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00015-61102 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/13/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
12/13/2018
Indictment - For Public
12/14/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/15/2018
Pretrial Services Report
6
12/17/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/17/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12/19/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/19/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
11
12/19/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
12
12/19/2018
Order of Detention
13
01/08/2019
Order
14
01/24/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
01/25/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
01/29/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/29/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
01/30/2019
Third Party Custodian Report
01/30/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
02/04/2019
Third Party Custodian Report
25
02/07/2019
Bail Review Hearing
26
02/07/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
27
02/07/2019
Order of Release
28
02/20/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/21/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
03/06/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
32
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
03/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.