USA v. Buchholz
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00003 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
79
06/23/2018
Violation Disposition Report
80
06/26/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
08/28/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
10/30/2018
Judgment on Revocation
86
10/30/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.