USA v. Burris
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00082-51448 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
55
08/14/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
11/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
01/25/2019
Violation Disposition Report
01/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
01/28/2019
Appear
01/28/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
02/01/2019
Judgment on Revocation
65
02/01/2019
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.