USA v. Bush
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00081 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
30
05/22/2018
Unopposed Motion
31
05/22/2018
Unopposed Motion
05/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
07/11/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
07/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
07/18/2018
Plea Agreement
37
07/18/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
07/18/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
07/19/2018
Memorandum
07/24/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
07/25/2018
Forfeiture of Property
44
07/30/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
45
08/29/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
46
09/12/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/13/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/13/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
10/15/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
49
10/23/2018
Continue
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
11/02/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
11/05/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
11/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
11/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
56
11/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/08/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
11/27/2018
Status Report
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
12/07/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.