USA v. Butler et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00038 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
140
06/01/2018
Report and Recommendation - Final
06/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
142
06/08/2018
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
06/08/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
144
06/19/2018
Hearing
06/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
149
07/03/2018
Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
150
07/03/2018
Declaration
151
07/03/2018
USCA Case Number
152
07/03/2018
USCA Time Schedule Order
07/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
161
07/19/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
162
07/19/2018
Order of Release
07/19/2018
Docket Annotation re Incorrect PDF Associated (Text entry; no document attached.)
163
07/24/2018
Designation of Record on Appeal
08/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
165
08/28/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
166
08/31/2018
Status Report
167
09/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
168
09/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
169
09/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
170
09/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
171
09/05/2018
Supplement
172
09/05/2018
Continue
09/11/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
180
09/18/2018
Judgment
181
09/18/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
182
09/24/2018
Dismiss
183
09/26/2018
USCA Mandate
184
09/26/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
185
09/28/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
187
09/28/2018
Criminal Judgment of Discharge
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.