USA v. Cain
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00178 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
24
07/18/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/20/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
08/08/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
27
08/08/2018
Unopposed Motion
28
08/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
29
11/19/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
30
11/21/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.