USA v. Cao et al.
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00059-60059 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
72
02/26/2019
Hearing
73
02/26/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
74
02/28/2019
Order
03/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
03/07/2019
Notice (Other)
78
03/11/2019
Order
03/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
03/13/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
81
03/14/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
03/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
03/18/2019
Plea Agreement
85
03/18/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
03/20/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.