USA v. Carle et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2008-cr-00002 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
393
06/01/2018
Notice (Other)
394
06/01/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
395
06/01/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
396
06/01/2018
Order of Release
06/01/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
397
06/05/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
398
06/05/2018
Notice (Other)
399
06/27/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/28/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
403
07/09/2018
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
07/09/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
414
10/11/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
415
10/11/2018
Notice (Other)
416
10/11/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
417
10/11/2018
Order of Release
418
10/19/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
420
10/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
11/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.