USA v. Carranza et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00051-59887 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
32
06/08/2018
Continue
06/13/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/13/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
07/30/2018
Order
37
07/30/2018
Order
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
10/05/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
10/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
10/29/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
44
11/06/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
45
11/08/2018
Plea Agreement
46
11/08/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
47
11/08/2018
Plea Agreement
48
11/08/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
11/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
11/21/2018
Notice (Other)
11/26/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
12/14/2018
Continue
12/31/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
01/09/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
63
02/26/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
03/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
03/19/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
68
03/25/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
69
03/25/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
72
03/27/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
03/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.