USA v. Carranza et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00051-59888 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
60
01/30/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
61
02/06/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/07/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address
03/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
03/27/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/28/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
05/13/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
78
05/17/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
79
05/22/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.