USA v. Carroll
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00021 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
201
05/21/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
202
05/21/2018
Declaration
204
05/22/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
205
06/25/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
206
06/25/2018
Declaration
208
06/26/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
209
07/25/2018
Supplement
210
07/25/2018
Memorandum
211
07/25/2018
Declaration
212
07/25/2018
Declaration
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.