USA v. Carroll
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00021-47751 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
201
05/21/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
202
05/21/2018
Declaration
204
05/22/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
205
06/25/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
206
06/25/2018
Declaration
208
06/26/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
209
07/25/2018
Supplement
210
07/25/2018
Memorandum
211
07/25/2018
Declaration
212
07/25/2018
Declaration
213
09/19/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
214
09/20/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
215
11/14/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
216
11/14/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
217
11/14/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
218
01/16/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
219
01/16/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
220
02/19/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
221
02/19/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
222
02/21/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
223
02/25/2019
Response in Opposition
224
02/25/2019
Declaration
225
03/22/2019
Response in Support
226
03/22/2019
Declaration
227
03/22/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
228
03/22/2019
Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
229
03/25/2019
USCA Case Number
230
03/25/2019
USCA Time Schedule Order
231
03/28/2019
Order
232
04/05/2019
Order
233
04/18/2019
Memorandum
234
04/18/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
235
04/24/2019
Order
236
04/25/2019
USCA Order
237
05/08/2019
Statement
238
05/14/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.