USA v. Carter
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00127-60914 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/18/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
10/18/2018
Indictment - For Public
3
10/18/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
10/18/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
10/18/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/29/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10/31/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
10/31/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
10
10/31/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
11
10/31/2018
Order of Detention
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/15/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
11/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/26/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
11/27/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
21
01/08/2019
Order
01/10/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/10/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/10/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
02/22/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/23/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
03/01/2019
Hearing
26
03/01/2019
Status Report
03/04/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
31
04/01/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
32
04/01/2019
Status Report
04/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
Order Setting Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
04/09/2019
Unopposed Motion
36
04/09/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
37
04/09/2019
Declaration
04/09/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
04/16/2019
Continue
04/16/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
04/23/2019
Plea Agreement
43
04/23/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/24/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
05/14/2019
Order
48
05/15/2019
Notice (Other)
49
05/17/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.