USA v. Castillo et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00016 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
55
07/25/2018
Forfeiture of Property
56
07/25/2018
Forfeiture of Property
57
08/16/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
58
08/17/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
59
08/17/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
60
08/30/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
61
08/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/31/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
09/19/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
64
09/21/2018
Hearing
65
09/24/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
66
09/27/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
10/29/2018
Notice (Other)
73
10/31/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
10/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
11/07/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/08/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
11/07/2018
Unopposed Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.