USA v. Castillo et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00016-58552 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
82
02/19/2019
Continue
83
02/20/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
84
02/20/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
02/20/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
05/09/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
98
05/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
05/20/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
05/23/2019
Judgment
108
05/23/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.