USA v. Chatman
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00097-52023 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
102
11/27/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
103
11/27/2018
Order of Detention
104
11/27/2018
Notice (Other)
11/27/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
105
11/27/2018
Unopposed Motion
108
12/06/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
109
12/06/2018
Order of Release
110
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12/27/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.