USA v. Chenery
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2007-cr-00128 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
217
07/12/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
218
07/12/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
219
07/12/2018
Order of Release
07/12/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
220
07/17/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
07/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
222
07/27/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
223
07/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.