USA v. Chenery
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2007-cr-00128-6521 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
217
07/12/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
218
07/12/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
219
07/12/2018
Order of Release
07/12/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
220
07/17/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
07/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
222
07/27/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
223
07/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
225
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
09/24/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
227
10/04/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
10/10/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
229
01/07/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/08/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
231
01/24/2019
Hearing
01/28/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
233
01/30/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
234
01/30/2019
Bail Review Hearing
235
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address
03/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
237
03/13/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
03/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
241
04/12/2019
Status Report
242
04/19/2019
Notice (Other)
04/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
244
05/22/2019
Continue
05/23/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.