USA v. Christensen
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2004-cr-00052 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
30
05/21/2018
Certificate of Service
31
06/19/2018
Notice (Other)
32
06/29/2018
Notice (Other)
33
07/17/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
34
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.