USA v. Christiansen
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00005-59539 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
22
06/27/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
06/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
09/18/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
10/23/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/25/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
01/02/2019
Forfeiture of Property
01/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
01/08/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
01/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
01/15/2019
Unopposed Motion
37
01/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
38
01/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
01/15/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
01/16/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
41
01/16/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
01/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
01/17/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.