USA v. Ciancio
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mj-00367 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/28/2018
Complaint
06/29/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/29/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
3
07/02/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
07/02/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
07/02/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/02/2018
Pretrial Services Report
07/03/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
07/03/2018
Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
10
07/03/2018
Order of Detention
11
07/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
07/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.