USA v. Cleveland-McMichael
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00161 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
24
05/24/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
06/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
06/14/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
27
06/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
28
06/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
29
06/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
30
06/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
06/28/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
07/02/2018
Judgment
34
07/02/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.